EP1089490 - System for connecting communication - endpoints of a first telecommunications network with at least another telecommunications network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenovis GmbH & Co. KG Kleyerstrasse 94 60362 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Tenovis GmbH & Co. KG Kleyerstrasse 94 60326 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weirauch, Andreas Alpenring 18 D - 85649 Brunnthal. / DE | 02 /
Wiese, Garrelt Schlesierstr. 16 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Beck, Josef Patentanwaltskanzlei Wilhelm & Beck Prinzenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Beck, Josef c/o Patentanwaltskanzlei Wilhelm & Beck Nymphenburger Strasse 139 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118572.7 | 26.08.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | DE1999146355 | 28.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19946355 | [2001/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1089490 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H04L41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Verbinden von Kommunikationsendpunkten eines ersten Telekommunikationsnetzwerkes mit wenigstens einem weiteren Telekommunikationsnetzwerk | [2001/14] | English: | System for connecting communication - endpoints of a first telecommunications network with at least another telecommunications network | [2001/14] | French: | Système pour la liaison de points terminaux de communication d'un premier réseau de télécommunications avec au moins un autre réseau de télécommunications | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |