EP1081887 - Method of synchronising network elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Andreas Buckower Ring 37 12683 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Wahr, Alfons Pucher Strasse 52 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [2001/11] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
Müller, Andreas Am Waldberg 57 12683 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
Wahr, Alfons Pucher Strasse 52 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118674.1 | 29.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | DE1999141679 | 01.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19941679 | [2001/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081887 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/10] | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H04J3/0641 (EP);
H04J3/0679 (EP);
H04J2203/0042 (EP);
H04J2203/0089 (EP);
H04J3/0647 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Synchronisation von Netzelementen eines Netzes | [2001/10] | English: | Method of synchronising network elements | [2001/10] | French: | Procédé de synchronisation d'éléments de réseau | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |