EP1080678 - Pepper and salt delivering pot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acea Manodomestici S.R.L. Via Milano, 178 28883 Gravellona Toce (Verbania) / IT | [2001/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smeenk, Nico Piazza F.11i Beltrami, 14 28887 Omegna (Verbania) / IT | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00118696.4 | 29.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI00541 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: IT MI990541 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080678 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47J42/38 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
A47J42/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | Behälter zum Verteilen von Salz und Pfeffer | [2001/10] | English: | Pepper and salt delivering pot | [2001/10] | French: | Conteneur pour délivrer du sel et du poivre | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/03] | 08.06.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US1327385 (HAMMER WILLIE A) [X] 1,3,11 * page 2, line 5 - line 20; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4 [Y] 5,6,8-10; | [Y]DE29707753U (YANG HENG TE [TW]) [Y] 5,6 * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 2; figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [Y]FR1455806 (GUIPET) [Y] 8-10 * page 2, column L; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE29708203U (ZWEIER SEBASTIAN [DE]) [X] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US4819882 (STOTTMANN RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * column 5, line 37 - column 7, line 16; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]DE977169 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH) [A] 1 * page 2, line 84 - line 108; figures 2,3 * |