EP1099432 - A surgical swivel fixation ring device for use in eye surgery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cote, Dana 22 Lewis Lane Saugus, Massachusetts 01906 / US | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk, 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00118816.8 | 31.08.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | US19990437777 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: US 437777 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099432 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1099432 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099432 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
A61F9/007 (EP);
A61F9/013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/39] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Chirurgischer Schwenkhaltering zur Verwendung in der Augenchirurgie | [2001/20] | English: | A surgical swivel fixation ring device for use in eye surgery | [2001/20] | French: | Anneau chirurgical de fixation pivotant pour l'utilisation en chirurgie de l'oeil | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 11.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 05.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5951579 (DYKES RONALD E [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 56 - line 65 * * figures 1,5 *; | [A]DE19500708 (TECHNOMED GES FUER MED UND MED [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5108412 (KRUMEICH JORG H [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 29 - line 66 * |