EP1081047 - Cigarette hopper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Pomponia, 10 40133 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states G. D Societa per Azioni Via Pomponia, 10 40133 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spatafora, Mario Via del Lavoro, 56 40100 Bologna / IT | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2001/10] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00118864.8 | 31.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | IT1999BO00471 | 01.09.1999 Original published format: IT BO990471 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081047 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/04, A24C5/32 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
B65B19/04 (EP,US);
A24C5/325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/48] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ZIGARETTENTRICHTER | [2001/10] | English: | Cigarette hopper | [2001/10] | French: | TREMIE POUR CIGARETTES | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 08.09.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1926222 (CHARLES ARELT) [A] 1 * page 1, line 76 - page 2, line 70; figure - *; | [A]FR1475759 (SAS G D DI ENZO SERAGNOLI) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 8; figure - *; | [DY]FR2282370 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [DY] 1,2 * page 6, line 20 - page 8, line 27; figure - *; | [DY]FR2327923 (EFKA WERKE KIEHN GMBH FRITZ [DE]) [DY] 1,2 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 32; figure - *; | [A]GB2073155 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG); | [A]EP0141322 (FOCKE & CO [DE]); | [A]DE4407305 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 29; figure - * | by applicant | FR2282370 | FR2327923 | US5201162 |