EP1195360 - Method of forming SiO2-TiO2 glasses with low thermal expansion coefficient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Gerrit, Dr. Eppsteinstrasse 51 63456 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Deller, Klaus, Dr. Friedhofstrasse 47 63512 Hainburg / DE | 03 /
Mangold, Helmut, Dr. In der Gartel 2 63517 Rodenbach / DE | 04 /
Wagner, Christine Am Stahlhammer 59 66121 Saarbrücken / DE | 05 /
Clasen, Rolf, Prof. Dr. Beethovenstrasse 45 66125 Saarbrücken / DE | [2002/15] | Application number, filing date | 00118974.5 | 01.09.2000 | [2002/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195360 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C23/00, C03C3/06 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
C03C23/0095 (EP,US);
C03C3/06 (EP,US);
C03C3/076 (EP,US);
C03C2201/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von SiO2-TiO2-Gläsern mit geringem thermischen Ausdehnungskoeffizient | [2002/15] | English: | Method of forming SiO2-TiO2 glasses with low thermal expansion coefficient | [2002/15] | French: | Méthode de fabrication de verres SiO2-TiO2 avec un coefficient d'expansion faible | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62100443 ; | [X]US4039339 (ELMER THOMAS H, et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - line 62 * * claim 1 *; | [AX]GB2083806 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * example -; claims 1-7 * [X] 9; | [X]US5171344 (NODA SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 17 * * column 4, line 52 - line 58 * * claim - *; | [X] - "CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, ISSN 0009-2258, XP000376039 [X] 1-3,6-9 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 24, Database accession no. 1987-167500, XP002158617 & JPS62100443 A 19870509 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * | [DY] - ELMER T H, "USE OF ALKOXIDES IN THE PREPARATION OF LOW-EXPANSION RECONSTRUCTED TIO2-SIO2 GLASSES", GLASTECHNISCHE BERICHTE,DE,VERLAG DER DEUTSCHEN GLASTECHNISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT. FRANKFURT, (19921001), vol. 65, no. 10, pages 279 - 286, XP000321858 [DY] 1-9 * abstract * * Kapitel 2 : Experimental Procedure * | [Y] - MINEHAM, "Sintering of titania-silica powder compacts with a bimodal pore-size distribution", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (1992), vol. 147-148, pages 582 - 587, XP002158616 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * Kapitel 2 : Materials Kapitel 3.1 : Impregnation * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3093(05)80681-7 |