EP1085249 - Hydraulic damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS FRANCE S.A. Rue Alfred Moriniere, B.P. 59 45520 Chevilly / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Automotive Products France S.A. Rue Alfred Moriniere, B.P. 59 45520 Chevilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muller, Patrick 3, rue du Général De Gaulle 45450 Faye aux Loges / FR | 02 /
Compain, Laurent 62 Rue Renée Delattre 45770 Saran / FR | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger Automotive Products Group Limited Patent Department P.O. Box 2085 Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV31 3ZL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Morrall, Roger Automotive Products Group Limited, P.O. Box 1762, Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV31 3ZT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00119097.4 | 04.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | GB19990021683 | 15.09.1999 Original published format: GB 9921683 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1085249 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1085249 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/04 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
F16L55/041 (EP,US);
F16D25/14 (EP,US);
F16D48/02 (EP,US);
F16D2048/0215 (EP,US);
F16D2300/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/24] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Schwingungsdämpfer | [2001/12] | English: | Hydraulic damper | [2001/12] | French: | Amortisseur hydraulique | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 28.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5320203 (WILBER DARRIN F [US], et al) [AD] 1-26 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 60; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4417961 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1-26 * column 1, line 3 - line 22 * * column 4, line 5 - line 66; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1076283 (OSWALDS AND RIDGWAY LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 52 - page 2, line 112; figure . * | by applicant | US5320203 |