EP1184191 - High solids interactive coating compositions, ink jet recording medium and methods of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso North America Corporation P.O. Box 8050 Wisconsin Rapids Wisconsin 54495-8050 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Stora Enso North America Corporation P.O. Box 8050 Wisconsin Rapids, Wisconsin 54495-8050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schliesman, Leonard J. 1310 16th Street N. Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494 / US | 02 /
Tritz, Leland O. 4631 Plover Road Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494 / US | 03 /
Spreda, Karen K. 2340 Annes Drive Plover, WI 54467 / US | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Flosdorff, Jürgen Huss, Flosdorff & Partner GbR Klarweinstrasse 39 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Flosdorff, Jürgen, Dr. Alleestrasse 33 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00119104.8 | 04.09.2000 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1184191 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, C08K3/36, C09D129/04, // (C09D129/04, 125:04, 179:02) | [2002/10] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP);
C09D129/04 (EP);
B41M5/506 (EP);
B41M5/508 (EP);
B41M5/5218 (EP);
B41M5/5245 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D129/04, C08L2666/04, C08L2666/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Interaktive Beschichtungszusammensetzung mit hohem Feststoffanteil, Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsmedium und Herstellungsverfahren derselben | [2002/10] | English: | High solids interactive coating compositions, ink jet recording medium and methods of making same | [2002/10] | French: | Composition de revêtement interactive à haute teneur en solides, Milieu d'enregistrement par jet d'encre et méthodes de fabrication | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0439153 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-37 * page 3, line 46 - page 4, line 16 * * recording medium 3 *; | [A]JPH0872387 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08072387 A 19960319 (COPYER CO LTD) [A] 1,12,15,17,18,20,27,33 * abstract * |