EP1060763 - Radiation therapy and radiation surgery treatment system and methods of use of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shepherd, Joseph S. 2004 Le Droit Drive South Pasadena, CA 91030 / US | For all designated states Rand, Robert W. 521 N. Bristol Street Los Angeles California 90049 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Shepherd, Joseph S. 2004 Le Droit Drive South Pasadena, CA 91030 / US | ||
For all designated states Rand, Robert W. 521 N. Bristol Street Los Angeles California 90049 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00119265.7 | 26.03.1996 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1060763 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1060763 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, A61B6/00 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
A61B6/4441 (EP);
A61N5/1084 (EP);
A61N2005/1094 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/51] | A61N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | System zur Behandlung mittels Strahlentherapie und in der Strahlenchirurgie, sowie Verfahren zur Verwendung dieses Systems | [2000/51] | English: | Radiation therapy and radiation surgery treatment system and methods of use of same | [2000/51] | French: | Système de traitement par radiothérapie et radiochirurgie et procédés d'utilisation de ce système | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96923188.5 / EP1015076 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   09.04.2001 | 31.03.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0627198 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,19 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4230129 (LEVEEN HARRY H) [A] 10,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5471516 (NUNAN CRAIG S [US]) [A] 10,20 * abstract *; | [A]WO9413205 (ACCURAY INC [US], et al) [A] 10,20 * abstract * |