EP1085119 - Hydraulic device with a sensor for electric household appliances, in particular for washing machines, and its method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/12] | Sensor for hydraulic devices of electric household appliances, in particular washing machines, and hydraulic device integrating said sensor | ||
[2007/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELTEK S.p.A. Str. Valenza 5/A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sassone, Luigi Via Rivetta 18 Casale Monferrato (AL) / IT | 02 /
Belfiore, Stefano Via Casale 14 Borgo S. Martino (AL) / IT | 03 /
Bianchi, Luciano Via Cascina Costa Lora 43/A Rosignano Monferrato (AL) / IT | 04 /
Savini, Paolo Cantone Brina 62/A Casale popolo (AL) / IT | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Dini, Roberto, et al Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dini, Roberto, et al Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 10 10060 None (TO) / IT | ||
Former [2004/03] | Dini, Roberto, Dr. Ing., et al c/o Metroconsult S.r.l. Piazza Cavour 3 10060 None (Torino) / IT | ||
Former [2001/12] | Dini, Roberto, Dr. Ing. Via Castagnole, 59 10060 None (Torino) / IT | Application number, filing date | 00120078.1 | 15.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | IT1999TO00787 | 15.09.1999 Original published format: IT TO990787 | [2001/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1085119 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1085119 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085119 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, G01F15/18 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
D06F39/081 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/12] | D06F39/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Vorrichtung mit einem Sensor für Haushaltsgeräte, insbesondere für Waschmaschinen, und Herstellungsverfahren einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2007/10] | English: | Hydraulic device with a sensor for electric household appliances, in particular for washing machines, and its method of manufacture | [2007/10] | French: | Dispositif hydraulique avec détecteur pour appareils ménagers, en particulier pour machines à laver, et procédé de fabrication d'un tel dispositif | [2007/10] |
Former [2001/12] | Sensor für hydraulische Vorrichtungen von Haushaltgeräten , insbesondere von Waschmaschinen, und hydraulische Vorrichtung mit einem solchen Sensor | ||
Former [2001/12] | Sensor for hydraulic devices of electric household appliances, in particular washing machines, and hydraulic device integrating said sensor | ||
Former [2001/12] | Détecteur pour dispositifs hydrauliques d'appareils domestiques, en particulier de machines à laver, et dispositif hydraulique équipé d'un tel détecteur | Examination procedure | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 16.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2007 | BE | 14.11.2007 | CH | 14.11.2007 | CY | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | LI | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | [2010/11] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2433256 (GEBHARD HANS) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,12-16,19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0121734 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [A] 1-4,7,8,10,12,14-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3640077 (LEHMANN W MINOL MESSTECH [DE]) [A] 1-14,16 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4229159 (SAMECO MESSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-14,16,19 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 19 * * column 4, lines 16-41 * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 39; figure 8 *; | [A]DE19650861 (ELTEK SPA [IT]) [A] 16-20 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 21; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE19548514 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 16-19* the whole document *; | [XA]DE29800726U (KOERNER HANS HOLGER [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-14,16,19 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 22 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 19; figure 1 * [A] 8,9 |