EP1087135 - Non-axisymmetric hollow swash plate compressor piston [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states ALTEX Co., Ltd. 521, Nagashima Hamakita-city Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states ALTEX Co., Ltd. 521, Nagashima Hamakita-city, Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448 / JP | ||
For all designated states ALTEX Co., Ltd. 521, Nagashima Hamakita-city, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Takayuki K.K. Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Takamatsu, Masato K.K. Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120134.2 | 20.09.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | JP19990267131 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26713199 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1087135 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1087135 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/08 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
F04B27/0878 (EP,US);
F04B25/00 (KR);
Y10T29/49236 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4924 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49249 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/18] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nichtaxialsymmetrischer hohler Taumelscheibenkompressorkolben | [2001/13] | English: | Non-axisymmetric hollow swash plate compressor piston | [2001/13] | French: | Piston creux d'un compresseur à plateau en biais non axisymétrique | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 08.02.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5877736 ; | [Y]GB2090780 (IMP CLEVITE INC) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 45 - column 4, line 56; figures 1,6 *; | [A]US4651631 (AVEZOU JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 4, lines 5-10 *; | [A]US5575172 (BONNY PIERRE [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5630353 (MITTLEFEHLDT KURT R [US], et al) [A] 2,7,8 * abstract ** column 4, lines 25-34 *; | [Y]US5642654 (PAREKH MAHENDRA B [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, lines 6-29 * * page 1, lines 53-57 *; | [YA]EP0896854 (CALSONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-9 * abstract * [A] 2-5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830730), vol. 007, no. 173, Database accession no. (M - 232), & JP58077736 A 19830511 (YUKIHIKO UCHIDA) [A] 1,3,4,8,9 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH11152239 |