EP1088635 - Method for manufacturing antislip ceramic floor tiles which maintain a glossy and brilliant color and organoleptic appearance substantially identical to wall tiles, and tiles obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ri-Wal Ceramiche S.p.A. Via Ghiarola Nuova, 101 41042 Fiorano Modenese (Modena) / IT | [2001/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ronchetti, Claudio Strada Sant'Onofrio, 99 41100 Modena / IT | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano Gardi Patents, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano Gardi Patents, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00120200.1 | 25.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | IT1999MO00203 | 28.09.1999 Original published format: IT MO990203 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1088635 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1088635 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/04, C04B41/50, C03C8/14 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP);
B28B11/04 (EP);
B28B11/044 (EP);
C03C8/08 (EP);
C03C8/14 (EP);
C04B41/52 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B33/00 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/0072, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4572 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4578, C04B41/5022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, PT [2003/03] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von mit Wandfliesen identischen , rutschfesten , keramischen Fliesen mit glänzenden Farben und organoleptischen Aussehen und durch das Verfahren hergestellte Fliesen | [2001/14] | English: | Method for manufacturing antislip ceramic floor tiles which maintain a glossy and brilliant color and organoleptic appearance substantially identical to wall tiles, and tiles obtained thereby | [2001/14] | French: | Dispositif pour la fabrication de carreaux antidérapants en céramique conservant des couleurs brillantes et un aspect organoleptique et présentant substantiellement l'aspect de carreaux pour murs , et carreaux obtenus par le procédé | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/22] | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05117062 ; | [X]JPH06128066 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930830), vol. 017, no. 475, Database accession no. (C - 1103), & JP05117062 A 19930514 (TOTO LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940810), vol. 018, no. 427, Database accession no. (C - 1235), & JP06128066 A 19940510 (INAX CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 23, Database accession no. 1994-188816, XP002023066 [ ] * abstract * |