EP1089233 - Method and apparatus for displaying polygon images, and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/46] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states KCE Tokyo Inc. 3-25, Kanda Jimbo-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minami, Tatsuma, KCE Tokyo Inc. 3-25, Kanda Jimbo-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | 02 /
Murayama, Takanori, KCE Tokyo Inc. 3-25, Kanda Jimbo-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/14] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Gbr P.O. Box 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120310.8 | 15.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | JP19990280871 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 28087199 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1089233 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1089233 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
G06T15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/50] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Darstellung Polygonbilder und Speichermedium | [2001/14] | English: | Method and apparatus for displaying polygon images, and recording medium | [2001/14] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour afficher des images de polygones et moyen d'enregistrement | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP1033682 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [XP] 1-3,7,8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030]; figures 8-10 *; | [A]US5767857 (NEELY SHAWN R [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 1, line 47 - line 26 *; | [Y]US5748198 (TAKEDA MASAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 11 * column 2, line 8 - line 17 * | [X] - JAMES D. FOLEY ET AL, Computer Graphics, Principles and Practice, ADDISON-WESLEY, (199707), XP002201174 [X] 9,16 * page 666, paragraph 15.3.2 - page 667 * | [XY] - GOOCH B ET AL, "Interactive Technical Illustration", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1999 SYMPOSIUM ON INTERACTIVE 3D GRAPHICS. ATLANTA, GA, APRIL 26 - 28, 1999, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON INTERACTIVE 3D GRAPHICS, NEW YORK, NY: ACM, US, (19990426), ISBN 1-58113-082-1, pages 31 - 38, XP002186398 [X] 9,10,16 * paragraph [5.1.2] * [Y] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/300523.300526 | [XA] - MARKOSIAN L ET AL, "REAL-TIME NONPHOTOREALISTIC RENDERING", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS. SIGGRAPH 97. LOS ANGELES, AUG. 3 - 8, 1997, READING, ADDISON WESLEY, US, (19970803), ISBN 0-201-32220-7, pages 415 - 420, XP000765842 [X] 9,10,16 * Paragraph 2.; page 418, column R, line 4 - line 14 * [A] |