EP1188533 - Tie bar-less injection moulding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGEL AUSTRIA GmbH Ludwig-Engel-Strasse 1 4311 Schwertberg / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Engel Austria GmbH Ludwig-Engel-Strasse 1 4311 Schwertberg / AT | ||
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states ENGEL MASCHINENBAU GESELLSCHAFT MBH Ludwig-Engel-Strasse 1 A-4311 Schwertberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urbanek, Otto Landstrasse 13 4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
Kappelmüller, Werner Lina 8 4311 Schwertberg / AT | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Hofinger, Engelbert Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Hofinger, Engelbert, Dr.Dr. Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 00120375.1 | 18.09.2000 | [2002/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188533 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188533 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/04, B29C45/17 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
B29C45/1761 (EP);
B29C45/062 (EP);
B29C2045/1768 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE [2002/50] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Holmlose Spritzgiessmaschine | [2002/12] | English: | Tie bar-less injection moulding machine | [2002/12] | French: | Machine de moulage par injection sans colonnes | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 22.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.10.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.10.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH386687 (TURNER MACHINERY LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 13 - line 70; figure - *; | [X]US4144010 (FENNER WERNER) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 16; figure - *; | [A]WO9802291 (ENGEL GMBH MASCHBAU [AT], et al) [A] 1* page 3, line 1 - line 30; figure - * |