EP1098101 - Trim valve for a fluid operated friction torque transmitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION 300 Renaissance Center Detroit Michigan 48265-3000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states General Motors Corporation 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, Michigan 48265-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hall, Arthur, III 870 Lanyard Drive Cicero, IN 46034 / US | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Gbr P.O. Box 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120393.4 | 18.09.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | US19990435673 | 08.11.1999 Original published format: US 435673 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1098101 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1098101 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16D48/06, F16H61/02, F16D25/12 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
F16H61/0251 (EP,US);
F16D48/066 (EP,US);
G05D16/2024 (EP,US);
F16D2048/0221 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1026 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1045 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70294 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70406 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7042 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0253 (EP,US);
F16H61/061 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86614 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87209 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/19] | F16D48/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/51] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abgleichventil für druckmittelbetätigtes Reibmoment-Übertragungsgerät | [2001/19] | English: | Trim valve for a fluid operated friction torque transmitting device | [2001/19] | French: | Valve d'ajustement pour dispositif de transfert d'un couple de friction à actionnement par fluide | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/35] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8400794 (CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO [US]) [A] 1,4,5* the whole document *; | [A]US5234092 (MAHONEY JOHN E [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19820389 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * figure -; claims 11,13 * |