EP1104125 - System, transmitter and receiver for code division multiplex transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Hideo c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Serizawa, Mutsumu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Yokoi, Tokihiko c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Eiichi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
Hirakawa, Shuji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120402.3 | 18.09.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | JP19990337403 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: JP 33740399 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1104125 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1104125 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1104125 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/216, H04L1/00, H04J13/00, H04B1/707, H04J3/06, H04B7/26 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
H04L1/0059 (EP,US);
H04B1/7073 (KR);
H04B1/7075 (EP,US);
H04J13/00 (EP,US);
H04J3/0605 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L1/0075 (EP,US);
H04L1/0078 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | H04B7/216, H04L1/00, H04J13/00, H04B1/707, H04J3/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/28] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System, Sender und Empfänger für Kodemultiplex-übertragung | [2001/22] | English: | System, transmitter and receiver for code division multiplex transmission | [2001/22] | French: | Système, émetteur et récepteur pour transmission à multiplexage par répartition de codes | [2005/42] |
Former [2001/22] | Système, transmetteur et récepteur pour transmission à multiplexage par répartition de codes | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 15.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5260967 (SCHILLING DONALD L [US]) [A] 1,14,23,24,34,40 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 25 *; | [A]US5930366 (JAMAL KARIM [JP], et al) [A] 1,14,23,24,34,40* column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 24 * |