EP1086926 - Delivery nozzle with coated outlet pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marconi Commerce Systems GmbH & Co.KG Ferdinand-Henze-Strasse 9 33154 Salzkotten / DE | [2001/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koslowsky, Uwe Molenbrede 1 59590 Geseke / DE | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Marconi Intellectual Property, Marrable House, The Vineyards, Gt. Baddow Chelmsford, Essex CM2 7QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Marconi Intellectual Property Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00120451.0 | 19.09.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | DE1999145293 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19945293 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086926 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/37 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
B67D7/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/51] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zapfpistole mit beschichtetem Auslassrohr | [2001/13] | English: | Delivery nozzle with coated outlet pipe | [2001/13] | French: | Pistolet de distribution avec tube de sortie pourvu d'un revêtement | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/37] | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.11.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2088758 (PORTANIER GILBERT); | [A]DE3811492 (GROSS RUDOLF DR [DE]); | [XY]FR2714900 (ELF ANTAR FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * figures 2,3; claims 1,8,9 * [Y] 5,11; | [Y]US5765609 (DALHART MARK D [US], et al) [Y] 5,11 * column 13, line 62 - column 14, line 30; figure 18 *; | [DA]DE19715868 (SALZKOTTEN TANKANLAGEN [DE]) [DA] 8,9 * figure 2; claims 1,4 * | by applicant | DE1971586U |