EP1089055 - Method for measuring the relative orientation of a hollow cylinder and an associated plane cut [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/14] | Device and method for measuring the relative orientation of a hollow cylinder and an associated plane cut | ||
[2001/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prüftechnik Dieter Busch AG Oskar-Messter-Strasse 19-21 85737 Ismaning / DE | [2001/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermann, Michael Roderstrasse 10 78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2001/14] | Application number, filing date | 00120609.3 | 21.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | DE1999147292 | 01.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19947292 | [2001/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089055 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1089055 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/22 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
G01B11/26 (EP,US);
G01C21/16 (EP,US);
Y10S33/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2002/01] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Vermessen der gegenseitigen Orientierung eines Hohlzylinders und einer zugeordneten Schnittfläche | [2001/47] | English: | Method for measuring the relative orientation of a hollow cylinder and an associated plane cut | [2001/47] | French: | Méthode pour l'orientation relative d'un cylindre creux et une surface de coupe associée | [2001/47] |
Former [2001/14] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Vermessen der gegenseitigen Orientierung eines Hohlzylinders und einer zugeordneten Schnittfläche | ||
Former [2001/14] | Device and method for measuring the relative orientation of a hollow cylinder and an associated plane cut | ||
Former [2001/14] | Dispositif et méthode pour l'orientation relative d'un cylindre creux et une surface de coupe associée | Examination procedure | 05.01.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 01.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10160433 ; | [A]US5038485 (BEISSBARTH OSMOND [DE]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [A]DE19546405 (BUSCH DIETER & CO PRUEFTECH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US5801303 (ROSENQUIST GERALD A [US]) [A] 1,2,4* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10160433 A 19980619 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * |