EP1089028 - Rigid line for a brake, fuel or hydraulic system in motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc. 1105 North Market Street Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sausner, Andreas Obermainstrasse 13 60314 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Henkenjohann, Martin Brockhagener Strasse 103A 33649 Bielefeld / DE | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120961.8 | 26.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | DE1999146544 | 28.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19946544 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1089028 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1089028 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1089028 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L9/147, F16L9/12, B32B1/08, B32B15/08 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
F16L9/125 (EP,US);
F16L9/121 (EP,US);
F16L9/147 (EP,US);
Y10S138/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/14] | F16L9/147, F16L9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/14] | Title | German: | Starres Rohr für ein Brems-,Kraft- oder Hydrauliksystem in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2001/14] | English: | Rigid line for a brake, fuel or hydraulic system in motor vehicles | [2001/14] | French: | Tuyau rigide pour un système de freinage,de carburant ou hydraulique dans un véhicule automobile | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.06.2005 | BE | 22.06.2005 | CH | 22.06.2005 | FI | 22.06.2005 | LI | 22.06.2005 | NL | 22.06.2005 | DK | 22.09.2005 | GR | 22.09.2005 | SE | 22.09.2005 | CY | 26.09.2005 | IE | 26.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | PT | 29.11.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
IE | 26.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
IE | 26.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
NL | 22.06.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
LI | 22.06.2005 | ||
GR | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
PT | 29.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 22.06.2005 | |
BE | 22.06.2005 | ||
FI | 22.06.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 22.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3830261 (HOCHBERG M, et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [XY]US3901281 (MORRISEY EDWARD J) [X] 1-6,8,10-13 * the whole document * [Y] 7,9,14; | [Y]US4853297 (TAKAHASHI TERUHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]US5520223 (IORIO RALPH A [US], et al) [Y] 7,9,14 * the whole document * |