EP1087036 - Method and apparatus for observing porous amorphous film, and method and apparatus for forming the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Tokyo Electron Limited 3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Shigeru, c/o Tokyo Electron Limited 650, Mitsuzawa, Hosaka-cho Nirasaki-shi, Yamanashi 407-0192 / JP | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121042.6 | 27.09.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | JP19990272077 | 27.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27207799 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1087036 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1087036 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/56, C23C16/22 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
C23C16/52 (EP,US);
C23C16/045 (EP,US);
G01R31/2653 (EP,US);
G01R31/2831 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/51] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtung zur Beobachtung einer porösen, amorphen Schicht und Methode und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung derselben. | [2004/18] | English: | Method and apparatus for observing porous amorphous film, and method and apparatus for forming the same | [2001/13] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour observer le film amorphe poreux et la méthode et l'appareil pour fermer le film. | [2001/13] |
Former [2001/13] | Methode und Vorrichtung zur Beobachtung einer porösen, amorphen Schucht und Methode und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung derselben. | Examination procedure | 27.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 22.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0768388 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 12-17; | [A]US5698901 (ENDO KAZUHIKO [JP]) [A] 12-17; | [A]WO9919533 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 12-17; | [A]US5900290 (YANG HONGNING [US], et al)[A] 12-17 |