EP1088830 - Hepatitis b surface antigen particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDEVA HOLDINGS B.V. Churchill-Laan 223 1078 ED Amsterdam / NL | [2001/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thoma, Hans A. Giselastrasse 3/V 80802 München / DE | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00121167.1 | 22.06.1988 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | EP19870108914 | 22.06.1987 Original published format: EP 87108914 | EP19870108915 | 22.06.1987 Original published format: EP 87108915 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1088830 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1088830 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/02, A61K39/29, C12N15/40, A61P31/14 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
C07K14/445 (EP);
C12N15/62 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP);
A61K2039/5258 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/40 (EP);
C07K2319/735 (EP);
C12N2730/10122 (EP);
C12N2730/10123 (EP);
C12N2740/15022 (EP);
C12N2770/32422 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2005/01] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Partikel von Hepatitis B Oberflächenantigen | [2001/14] | English: | Hepatitis b surface antigen particles | [2001/14] | French: | Particules de l'antigène de surface de l'hépatitie B | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/29] | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/29] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88109946.9 / EP0304578 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0156712 (GRP GENIE GENETIQUE [FR], et al); | [X]EP0198474 (ENDOTRONICS INC [US]); | [PX]EP0244924 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [PX]EP0248410 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]); | [PX]EP0250253 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]) |