EP1092600 - Airbag module with housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73553 Alfdorf / DE | [2001/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Acker, Dominique Rechbergstrasse 7 73553 Alfdorf / DE | 02 /
Bonnet, Jochen Am Schapfenbach 8 73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | 03 /
Dannenhauer, Reiner Rosenstrasse 21 73642 Welzheim / DE | 04 /
Hägele, Bernd Staufenstrasse 9 73571 Göggingen / DE | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Degwert, Hartmut Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121300.8 | 06.10.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | DE1999217942U | 12.10.1999 Original published format: DE 29917942 U | [2001/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1092600 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1092600 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B60R21/2176 (EP);
B29C45/0081 (EP);
B60R21/207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gassack-Modul mit Gehäuse | [2001/16] | English: | Airbag module with housing | [2001/16] | French: | Module de coussin gonflable et son boîtier | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/13] | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1143001 ; | [A]DE19614276 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [A] 1,2,4* figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11043001 A 19990216 (NIPPON PLAST CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * |