EP1091070 - Hinge with at least two hinge parts relatively pivotable with respect to each other along a common pivot axis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SFS intec Holding AG Nefenstrasse 30 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | [2002/05] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states SFS Industrie Holding AG Nefenstrasse 30 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berletti, Michele Via Democrito, 4 31021 Mogliano Veneto TV / IT | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/25] |
Former [2002/05] | Ludescher, Hans, et al SFS Gruppe Patentabteilung Rosenbergsaustrasse 10 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | ||
Former [2001/15] | Ludescher, Hans, et al SFS Stadler Gruppe Patentabteilung Nefenstrasse 30 9435 Heerbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 00121556.5 | 30.09.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | DE1999217550U | 05.10.1999 Original published format: DE 29917550 U | [2001/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1091070 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1091070 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/12, E05D5/02, E05D7/04 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
E05F1/1016 (EP);
E05D5/02 (EP);
E05F1/1215 (EP);
E05Y2600/622 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | E05F1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Extension states | RO | 11.12.2003 | Title | German: | Scharnier mit wenigstens zwei relativ zueinander um eine gemeinsame Drehachse verdrehbaren Scharnierteilen | [2001/15] | English: | Hinge with at least two hinge parts relatively pivotable with respect to each other along a common pivot axis | [2001/15] | French: | Charnière avec au moins deux éléments relativement pivotants l'un par rapport à l'autre le long d'un axe commun de pivotement | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3320846 (KELLERMANN REINHARD) [Y] 2 * page 10, line 12 - line 18; figure - *; | [Y]EP0249945 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [Y] 3,4 * column 2, line 27 - line 35 ** column 3, line 10 - line 18; figure - *; | [XY]EP0874123 (FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 2 * * column 7, line 6 - line 14; figure - * [Y] 2-4; | [E]EP1091069 (SFS IND HOLDING AG [CH]) [E] 1-4 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figure - *; | [E]EP1091070 (SFS IND HOLDING AG [CH]) [E] 1-4 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016]; figure - * |