EP1118568 - Stack formed from connected groups of interfolded sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue Green Bay Wisconsin 54307-9005 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue Green Bay Wisconsin 54307-9005 / US | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue Green Bay, Wisconsin 54307-9005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Craig, Grantland A. 3030 Wedge Court Green Bay, Wisconsin 54313 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Gary E. 1561 Waterford Court Green Bay, Wisconsin 54313 / US | 03 /
Heath, Peter A. 14 Hedigham Gardens Plymouth, Devon / GB | 04 /
Wunderlich, John H. 2880 Madrid Drive Green Bay, Wisconsin 54311 / US | 05 /
Hertel, James E. 3075 Bay View Green Bay, Wisconsin 54311 / US | 06 /
Luebke, Wayne W. 1077 Liberty Street Green Bay, Wisconsin 54304 / US | 07 /
Huempfner, Thomas D. 1871 Susie Drive Suamico, Wisconsin 54173 / US | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121614.2 | 02.10.2000 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | US20000488877 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: US 488877 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118568 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118568 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118568 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/24, B65H45/30 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
B65H45/30 (EP,US);
B65H45/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/30] | Title | German: | Stapel gebildet aus verbundenen Gruppen von ineinandergefalteten Blättern | [2001/30] | English: | Stack formed from connected groups of interfolded sheets | [2001/30] | French: | Pile formée des groupes connectés de feuilles enchevêtrées | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2002 | Observations by third parties | 28.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 05.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.12.2005 | BE | 14.12.2005 | CH | 14.12.2005 | CY | 14.12.2005 | FI | 14.12.2005 | LI | 14.12.2005 | NL | 14.12.2005 | DK | 14.03.2006 | GR | 14.03.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/50] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
BE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 14.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5033620 (DE LUCA RAYMOND F [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,11,13,16,17 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 21; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0459645 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] * figure - *; | [XA]DE4336933 (HOBEMA MASCHF HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1-4,16,17,19,20,22,23 * column 1, line 56 - column 1, line 63 * * column 2, line 7 - column 2, line 57 * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 24; figures 4,5 * * the whole document * [A] 5-15,18; | [X]EP0955260 (FAMECCANICA DATA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3,10-12,16,19,22 * abstract * |