EP1090977 - Color changing candle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.11.2001 [2001/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dragoco Gerberding & Co Aktiengesellschaft Dragocostrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friars, Gary 44 Aqueduct Avenue Midland Park, NJ 07432 / US | 02 /
McManus, Marjorie 76 Williamson Avenue Bloomfield, NJ 07003 / US | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121726.4 | 05.10.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | US19990414789 | 08.10.1999 Original published format: US 414789 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1090977 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1090977 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11C5/00 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
C11C5/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Farbändernde Kerze | [2001/15] | English: | Color changing candle | [2001/15] | French: | Bougie capable de changer de couleur | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP01036695 ; | [X]CN1099791 ; | [A]JPS5023405 ; | [X]US5208132 (KAMADA MASAYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1,10-12 * column 7, lines 40-42 * * claims 1-5 *; | [DA]US5578089 (ELSAMALOTY MOHAMED [US]) [DA] 1 * column 7, line 55 - line 57 * * column 8; table 2 *; | [Y]US5843194 (SPAULDING LAURA A [US]) [Y] 6,8 * examples 1-6 *; | [A]US5879694 (MORRISON DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - line 61 * * column 7, line 11 - line 25 ** claims 1,5 *; | [DY]US5882363 (SPAULDING LAURA A [US], et al) [DY] 6,7 * column 7, line 29 - line 33 * * claims 1,25,33 *; | [E]US6165234 (KANAKKANATT SEBASTIAN V [US]) [E] 1-5,9-13 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 39 * * column 2, line 65 - column 8, line 63 * * claims 3-9 *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890524), vol. 013, no. 224, Database accession no. (C - 599), & JP01036695 A 19890207 (YOSHIYUKI HIDAWA) [X] 1,3,4,13 * abstract * [Y] 6-8 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 22, Database accession no. 1997-236920, XP002159920 & CN1099791 A 19950308 (LIU Y) [X] 1,13 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 47, Database accession no. 1975-79591W, XP002159921 & JPS5023405 A 19750313 (PILOT INK CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |