EP1091048 - Construction machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Kobleco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugano, Takao, c/o Shinko Engineering Co., Ltd 1682-2, Motoima-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu, 503-0932 / JP | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121770.2 | 05.10.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | JP19990286905 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28690599 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1091048 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1091048 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1091048 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/08, F01P5/06, F01P11/10 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
E02F9/0891 (EP,US);
E02F9/00 (KR);
E02F3/325 (EP,US);
E02F9/0866 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | E02F9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE | [2001/15] | English: | Construction machine | [2001/15] | French: | MACHINE DE CHANTIER | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.10.2009 | 18.05.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | BE | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | GR | 10.03.2010 | ES | 20.03.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | [2011/07] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH05193377 ; | [XP]JPH11324014 ; | [XP]JPH11303135 ; | [Y]US3907053 (SAVAGE DONALD D) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, line 32 - column 7, line 42; figures 3-5 *; | [YA]US4770427 (HOWELL HOWARD E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 62; figures 2,3 * [A] 4-6; | [X]EP0412423 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19856375 (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [A] 4-6* column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 38; figure 3 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931117), vol. 017, no. 623, Database accession no. (M - 1511), & JP05193377 A 19930803 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-6 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11324014 A 19991126 (SHIN CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [XP] 1 * abstract * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11303135 A 19991102 (SHIN CATERPILLAR MITSUBISHI LTD) [XP] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | JPH06108494 | JPH0742384U | JPH07207702 | JPH1030255 | by applicant | JPH05193377 | JPH0742384U | JPH07207702 |