EP1094191 - Section member enveloping the edge of a flat article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEIDLE Drehteile GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 19 78549 Spaichingen / DE | For all designated states CRISTALUX KIRCHBERGER GLAS GMBH & CO. DR.-FRITZ-RIES-STRASSE 55481 KIRCHBERG / DE | [2001/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauter, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Gartenstrasse 12 78601 Mahlstetten / DE | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121817.1 | 06.10.2000 | [2001/17] | Priority number, date | DE1999218539U | 21.10.1999 Original published format: DE 29918539 U | [2001/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1094191 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1094191 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/54, E06B3/02, F16B5/02 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
E06B3/5454 (EP);
E06B3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/43] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Profil als Begrenzung für ein flächiges Gebilde | [2001/17] | English: | Section member enveloping the edge of a flat article | [2001/17] | French: | Profilé pour gainer des bords d' un substrat plat | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/21] | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.10.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.10.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7540299U (HAMACHER) [A] 1-6,9-11* page 4, line 12 - page 8, line 18; figure - *; | [YA]DE7831645U (GREFERATH) [Y] 3-6 * page 5, paragraph 6 - page 8, paragraph 3; figure - * [A] 1,2,7-9; | [XY]US4914888 (HANSON LAURENCE B [US]) [X] 1,2,7-9,11 * column 3, line 59 - column 7, line 2; figure - * [Y] 3-6,10; | [YA]EP0484178 (DORALCO INC [US]) [Y] 10 * page 5, line 2 - line 9; figure - * [A] 1-6,9,11 |