EP1067172 - Detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | For:AT
BE
CH
DK
ES
FI
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Daisan Kogyo Co., Ltd. 5-10-18, Higashi-gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DK
ES
FI
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Daisan Kogyo Co., Ltd. 5-10-18, Higashi-gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Daisan Kogyo Co., Ltd. 5-10-18, Higashi-gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Chie, c/o Daisan Kogyo Co., Ltd. 5-10-18, Higashi-gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Yanagihara, Kouji, c/o Daisan Kogyo Co., Ltd. 5-10-18, Higashi-gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Morikawa, Kyoko, c/o Daisan Kogyo Co., Ltd. 5-10-18, Higashi-gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 04 /
Saito, Hiroshi, c/o Daisan Kogyo Co., Ltd. 5-10-18, Higashi-gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 05 /
Arai, Norio, c/o Daisan Kogyo Co., Ltd. 5-10-18, Higashi-gotanda, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 06 /
Saito, Makoto, Kawasaki Works, Showa Denko K.K. 2-3, Chidoricho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 210 / JP | 07 /
Yamamoto, Tohru, Kawasaki Works, Showa Denko K.K. 2-3, Chidoricho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 210 / JP | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2001/02] | Application number, filing date | 00122176.1 | 30.12.1997 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | JP19970074646 | 12.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7464697 | JP19970074647 | 12.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7464797 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067172 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067172 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | [2001/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067172 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/10, C11D1/74, C11D1/66, C23G1/14, C23G1/22 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
C11D1/74 (EP,US);
C11D1/06 (EP,US);
C11D1/10 (EP,US);
C11D1/662 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D3/33 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/02] | C11D1/10, C11D1/74, C11D1/66, C23G1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittel | [2001/02] | English: | Detergent composition | [2001/02] | French: | Composition détergente | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97123003.2 / EP0864638 | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.03.2004 | BE | 24.03.2004 | CH | 24.03.2004 | FI | 24.03.2004 | IT | 24.03.2004 | LI | 24.03.2004 | NL | 24.03.2004 | DK | 24.06.2004 | GR | 24.06.2004 | SE | 24.06.2004 | ES | 05.07.2004 | PT | 24.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
IT | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
SE | 24.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]JPH09221697 ; | [A]DE2220295 (UNILEVER NV) [A] 1,2 * page 6; example 10; table 1 * * page 10, line 20 - line 28 * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0513948 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 24 - line 33 * * claims 1-8 *; | [X]WO9412606 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 27 - line 28 * * page 6, line 39 - page 7, line 24 * * page 8, line 43 - page 9, line 4 * * claims 1-8 *; | [A]DE4428823 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 40 - page 4, line 56 *; | [PX]EP0783034 (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * claims 1-13 * * page 6, line 43 - page 7, line 11 * * page 10, line 20 - line 24 *; | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 44, Database accession no. 97-475604, XP002094140 & JPH09221697 A 19970826 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [PA] 1 * abstract * |