EP1096516 - Low profile inductive component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COILCRAFT, INC. 1102 Silver Lake Road Cary, IL 60013 / US | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boytor, James G. 6002 Bur Lane Crystal Lake, ILL 60014 / US | 02 /
Girbaci, Catalin C. 10 Bright Oaks Circle Cary, ILL 60013 / US | 03 /
Gogny, Helen O. 908 Peter Street McHenry, ILL 60050 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122307.2 | 20.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | US19990428904 | 28.10.1999 Original published format: US 428904 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096516 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096516 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096516 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/29 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
H01F27/292 (EP,US);
H05K1/18 (KR);
H01F27/027 (EP,US);
H01F17/045 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | Niedrigprofil-Induktivkomponente | [2001/18] | English: | Low profile inductive component | [2001/18] | French: | Composant inductif de faible profil | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04018835.1 / EP1473744 | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.2004 | BE | 11.08.2004 | CH | 11.08.2004 | CY | 11.08.2004 | FI | 11.08.2004 | IT | 11.08.2004 | LI | 11.08.2004 | NL | 11.08.2004 | IE | 20.10.2004 | LU | 20.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | ES | 22.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
CY | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IT | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
LU | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
CY | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
LU | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07288210 ; | [A]JPH1154345 ; | [A]US5307041 (KATO SHIGENORI [JP], et al); | [AD]US5760669 (DANGLER WILLARD K [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07288210 A 19951031 (TDK CORP) [A] 1,9,12,19-21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11054345 A 19990226 (HITACHI FERRITE ELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 1,9,12,19-21 * abstract * |