EP1108627 - Seat belt retractor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECHNOLOGY, INC. 5300 Allen K. Breed Highway, P.O. Box 33050 Lakeland Florida 33807-3050 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states Breed Automotive Technology, Inc. 5300 Allen K. Breed Highway, P.O. Box 33050 Lakeland, Florida 33807-3050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Specht, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Im Harl 4 82340 Feldafing / DE | 02 /
Liedl, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sighart Strasse 4 80995 München / DE | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Nöth, Heinz Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122400.5 | 26.10.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | DE1999159956 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19959956 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1108627 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108627 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/34, B60R22/28, B60R22/44, B60R22/46 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
B60R22/44 (EP,US);
B60R22/34 (KR);
B60R22/3413 (EP,US);
B60R2022/284 (EP,US);
B60R2022/4666 (EP,US);
B60R22/4676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/11] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sicherheitsgurt-Retraktor | [2001/25] | English: | Seat belt retractor | [2001/25] | French: | Rétracteur de ceinture de sécurité | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 21.12.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE19647841 (HS TECH & DESIGN [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10167002 ; | [DA]DE19731689 (HS TECH & DESIGN [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1022201 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [PA] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020]; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10167002 A 19980623 (TAKATA KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19927731 | DE19940034 | DE19950855 |