EP1199685 - Apparatuses for selecting product in vending machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD 2-5-5, Keihanhondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hidekazu, Yajima 644-6 Menuma, Menuma-machi Oosato-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Toshiyuki, Takahashi 1-2-16 Fujimi, Fukiage-machi Kitaadachi-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Toshio, Itaya 1-9-12 Nagano Gyouda-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122713.1 | 18.10.2000 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199685 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G07F9/02 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
G07F9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2003/03] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Warenwahlvorrichtung eines Verkaufsautomaten | [2002/17] | English: | Apparatuses for selecting product in vending machine | [2002/17] | French: | Dispositif pour sélectionner un produit dans une machine de vente | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2000 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/15] | 04.03.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.09.2008 | 04.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9845819 (VEROOST INNOVATIE B V [NL], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 13; figure - * [Y] 2,4-9; | [Y]US4236649 (FELLNER VAN N, et al) [Y] 2,4-9 * column 3, line 9 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0547020 (AUSTRIA HAUSTECHNIK [AT]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 11; figure 1 *; | [A]US4821925 (WILEY RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]US4311227 (WATKINS KENNETH M) [A] 1,8,9 * column 4, line 5 - line 45 * * column 5, line 26 - line 35; figures 1,7,8 * |