EP1199093 - Filter element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARGO-HYTOS GmbH Industriestrasse 9 76703 Kraichtal-Menzingen / DE | [2004/15] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states ARGO GmbH für Fluidtechnik Industriestrasse 9 76703 Kraichtal-Menzingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mössinger, Klaus Schillerstrasse 2 74182 Obersulm-Willsbach / DE | 02 /
Deschner, Klaus Hermann-Hesse-Strasse 3 76684 Östringen / DE | 03 /
Breusch, Norbert Bruchstrasse 32b 74889 Sinsheim / DE | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122724.8 | 18.10.2000 | [2002/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199093 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D27/10, B01D27/14, B01D29/07 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
B01D35/147 (EP);
B01D29/21 (EP);
B01D29/54 (EP);
B01D2201/0415 (EP);
B01D2201/162 (EP);
B01D2201/305 (EP);
B01D2201/4084 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2003/03] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Filterelement | [2002/17] | English: | Filter element | [2002/17] | French: | Elément filtrant | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 25.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/30] | Request for further processing for: | 10.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10159530 ; | [XA]JPH09136003 ; | [A]JPH09144522 ; | [A]JP01080412 ; | [A]US3586171 (OFFER ROBERT J) [A] 13 * abstract *; | [X]US5037539 (HUTCHINS CHARLES K [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 48-54; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0441367 (FIAAM FILTER SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 21-24; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0558828 (GILARDINI SPA [IT]) [A] 13-19 * figures 2,5 *; | [X]RO104029 (SUBANSAMBLE SI PIESE DE SCHIMB [RO]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5395518 (GULSVIG BRENT A [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 33 *; | [X]DE19546440 (HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,9 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29815023U (HENGST WALTER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 21 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE29623867U (HENGST WALTER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 21* figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10159530 A 19980616 (EIKEN KOGYO KK) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09136003 A 19970527 (TOYO ROKI SEIZO KK;B C SEISAKUSHO:KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 4-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09144522 A 19970603 (KUBOTA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890629), vol. 013, no. 286, Database accession no. (C - 613), & JP01080412 A 19890327 (WAKO SANGYO KK) [A] 13 * abstract * |