EP1097844 - Vehicle rear seat monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. 1900 Richmond Road Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states TRW INC. 1900 Richmond Road Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaffran, Michelle Renee, TRW Inc. 1900 Richmond Road Lyndhurst, Ohio 44124 / US | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122726.3 | 18.10.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | US19990435600 | 05.11.1999 Original published format: US 435600 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1097844 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1097844 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/00, B60R11/02, B60R21/01, B60N2/00, H04N7/18 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H04N7/183 (EP);
B60N2/002 (EP);
B60N2/28 (EP);
B60N2/2863 (EP);
B60R1/008 (EP);
B60R11/04 (EP);
B60R2300/8013 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2002/21] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Überwachungssystem für einen hinteren Kraftfahrzeugsitz | [2001/19] | English: | Vehicle rear seat monitoring system | [2001/19] | French: | Systeme de surveillance de siège arrière d'un véhicule automobile | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 04.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN1092726 ; | [A]US4733956 (ERICKSON FRANK A [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US5576898 (RUBIN SHERI J [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]FR2753421 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US5845000 (BREED DAVID S [US], et al); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 16, Database accession no. 97-166420, XP002171607 & CN1092726 A 19940928 (YANG CHAO) [X] 1 * abstract * |