EP1093997 - Seat for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd. 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi Saitama 351-0012 / JP | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-0012 / JP | ||
For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd 7-27, Sakaecho 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-0012 / JP | ||
For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Kenichi, c/o TS Tech Co., Ltd. 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-0012 / JP | 02 /
Miyajima, Iwao, c/o TS Tech Co., Ltd. 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-0012 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Tetsuharu, c/o K.K.Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0113 / JP | 04 /
Yoshida, Takeshi, c/o K.K.Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0113 / JP | 05 /
Tomizawa, Tsutomu, c/o K.K.Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0113 / JP | 06 /
Yamaguchi, Masaaki, c/o KK.Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0113 / JP | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122729.7 | 18.10.2000 | [2001/17] | Priority number, date | JP19990296295 | 19.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29629599 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1093997 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1093997 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093997 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62J1/00, A47C7/20, B32B27/12 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
B62J1/00 (EP);
B62J1/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/17] | B62J1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2004/35] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitz | [2001/17] | English: | Seat for vehicles | [2001/17] | French: | Siège de véhicule | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9855352 (WILLIAMS GILBERT J [US]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5954403 (MOECK CHRISTOF [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0211482 ; | [A]US3833259 (PERSHING R) [A] 1,7,8 * column 3, lines 17-26; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0286409 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0569955 (KINKEL WERNER HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1052632 (HAROLD J. ATKINS) [A] 1,4,6,7 * page 2, line 16 - line 89 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900320), vol. 014, no. 147, Database accession no. (M - 0952), & JP02011482 A 19900116 (TOKYO SEAT KK) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract * |