EP1099883 - Device for recognizing the position of a selector lever [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baltes, Andreas Haingrabenstrasse 4 65843 Sulzbach / DE | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [2001/20] | Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys. Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122928.5 | 21.10.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | DE1999154173 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19954173 | DE1999160446 | 15.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19960446 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099883 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1099883 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | [2005/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099883 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/02, F16H59/10, H03K17/968 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
G05G1/015 (EP,US);
F16H59/105 (EP,US);
H03K17/968 (EP,US);
Y10S33/03 (EP,US);
Y10S33/15 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/20] | F16H59/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/44] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erkennung der Stellung eines Wahlhebels | [2001/20] | English: | Device for recognizing the position of a selector lever | [2001/20] | French: | Dispositif pour la reconnaissance de la position d'un sélecteur | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0844418 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,9 * the whole document * [A] ; | [XA]DE4038998 (J I CASE GMBH) [X] 1,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 3,4; | [A]EP0525855 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5519299 (FERRI VINCENT [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4523373 |