EP1149649 - Exchangeable continous casting nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akechi Ceramics Kabushiki Kaisha 1614, Akechi-cho Ena-gun Gifu-ken 509-7795 / JP | For all designated states TOKYO YOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Tekko Building, 1-8-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Akechi Ceramics Kabushiki Kaisha 1614, Akechi-cho Ena-gun Gifu-ken 509-7795 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOKYO YOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Tekko Building, 1-8-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasajim, Yasushi c/o Tokyo Yogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 3-1, Ohata-cho Tajimi-shi, Gifu-ken 507-8607 / JP | 02 /
Ando, Mitsuru c/o Akechi Ceramics K. K. 1614, Akechi-cho Ena-gun, Gifu-ken 509-7795 / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Shigeaki c/o Akechi Ceramics K. K. 1614, Akechi-cho Ena-gun, Gifu-ken 509-7795 / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2001/44] | 01 /
Sasajim, Yasushi c/o Tokyo Yogyo Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-1, Ohata-cho Tajimi-shi, Gifu-ken 507-8607 / JP | ||
02 /
Ando, Mitsuru c/o Akechi Ceramics K. K., 1614, Akechi-cho Ena-gun, Gifu-ken 509-7795 / JP | |||
03 /
Takahashi, Shigeaki c/o Akechi Ceramics K. K., 1614, Akechi-cho Ena-gun, Gifu-ken 509-7795 / JP | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Stenger Watzke Ring Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/44] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122935.0 | 21.10.2000 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | JP20000130547 | 28.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000130547 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149649 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149649 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1149649 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/50, B22D41/52, B22D11/10 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
B22D41/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT [2016/20] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Auswechselbare Giessdüze zum Kontinuierlichen Giessen | [2001/44] | English: | Exchangeable continous casting nozzle | [2001/44] | French: | Tuyère de coulée continue échangeable | [2001/44] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 21.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE VESUVIUS GROUP S.A. Rue de Douvrain 17 7011 Ghlin / BE Opponent's representative Debled, Thierry, et al, et al Vesuvius Group S.A. Intellectual Property Department Rue de Douvrain, 17 7011 Ghlin / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE VESUVIUS GROUP S.A. Rue de Douvrain 17 7011 Ghlin / BE Opponent's representative Debled, Thierry, et al, et al Vesuvius Group S.A. Intellectual Property Department Rue de Douvrain, 17 7011 Ghlin / BE | 25.10.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.03.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.03.2006 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 21.04.2006 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 25.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.07.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.04.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 02.02.2013 | Appeal received No. T0327/13 | 08.04.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.03.2015 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2015/10] | 17.07.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | 17.07.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.12.2004 | [2017/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3845943 (SHAPLAND J) [A] 1-9; | [XA]US5198126 (LEE STEPHEN J [GB]) [X] 1 [A] 2-9; | [A]EP0646430 (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO [JP])[A] 1-9 | by applicant | JPH0613457 | Opposition | US5188743 | EP0346378 | EP0441927 | US5467904 | US5558801 | WO0035614 |