EP1201474 - Side intrusion beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH Residenzstrasse 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH Residenzstrasse 1 33102 Paderborn / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH & Co. KG Residenzstrasse 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehringhoff, Ludger Tulpenweg 34 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Ksoll, Peter, et al Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Ksoll, Peter, Dr.-Ing., et al Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | Ksoll, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123024.2 | 24.10.2000 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1201474 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1201474 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
B60J5/0437 (EP);
B60J5/0444 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Title | German: | Seitenaufprallträger | [2002/18] | English: | Side intrusion beam | [2002/18] | French: | Poutre d' enfoncement lateral | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 01.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.02.2004 | ES | 25.02.2004 | FI | 25.02.2004 | FR | 25.02.2004 | GB | 25.02.2004 | IE | 25.02.2004 | IT | 25.02.2004 | NL | 25.02.2004 | DK | 25.05.2004 | GR | 25.05.2004 | SE | 25.05.2004 | PT | 25.07.2004 | AT | 24.10.2004 | LU | 24.10.2004 | BE | 31.10.2004 | CH | 31.10.2004 | LI | 31.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 25.02.2004 | |
ES | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
FR | 25.02.2004 | ||
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
IT | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
AT | 24.10.2004 | ||
LU | 24.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 25.02.2004 | |
ES | 25.02.2004 | ||
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
FR | 25.02.2004 | ||
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
AT | 24.10.2004 | ||
LU | 24.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
FR | 25.02.2004 | ||
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
AT | 24.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
AT | 24.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
NL | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GB | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
SE | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
SE | 25.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0498008 (AUSTRIA METALL [AT]); | [A]WO9843843 (JOALTO DESIGN INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 2-4,8 *; | [A]US5887938 (TOEPKER DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5895088 (KNOTT RONALD W [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO0015453 (COSMA INT INC [CA]) |