EP1096608 - Sensor system and connector used therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokouji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokouji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamei, Takashi c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Imai, Kiyoshi Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Sato, Toshinori Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | 04 /
Miyoshi, Kazuaki Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | 05 /
Shimokawa, Satoru Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2001/18] | 01 /
Kamei, Takashi, Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Imai, Kiyoshi, Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Sato, Toshinori, Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Miyoshi, Kazuaki, Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi / JP | |||
05 /
Shimokawa, Satoru, Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji-dori, Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Kilian, Helmut, Dr. Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123068.9 | 24.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | JP19990303195 | 25.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30319599 | JP20000099098 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000099098 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096608 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096608 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096608 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/24 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
H01R9/2458 (EP,US);
H03K17/94 (EP,US);
H03K2217/94094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/27] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sensorsystem und dafür verwendeter Verbinder | [2001/18] | English: | Sensor system and connector used therefor | [2001/18] | French: | Système capteur et son raccord | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 25.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5818123 (IWASAKI KOUMEI [JP], et al); | [A]US5920197 (PRICE NOAH M [US], et al) |