EP1096367 - Apparatus and method for digital data reproducing and transmitting, and storage media therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Masahiro Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123176.0 | 25.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | JP19990310344 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: JP 31034499 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096367 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096367 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04H7/00, G11B20/10 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2001/18] | G06F5/06 | Designated contracting states | FR, NL [2006/14] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Übertragung und Reproduktion von digitalen Daten, und Speichermedium dafür | [2001/18] | English: | Apparatus and method for digital data reproducing and transmitting, and storage media therefor | [2001/18] | French: | Appareil et méthode de transmission et de reproduction des données digitaux, et son moyen d'enregistrement | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/21] | 07.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5729225 (LEDZIUS ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * column 1, line 46 - column 3, line 29 * * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [X]US5729227 (PARK PAN-KI [KR]) [X] 1,6,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - line 31 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 65 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5732107 (PHILLIPS WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 52 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 5 * * column 8, line 14 - line 39 * * figure 2B *; | [X]US5793744 (KANERVA MIKKO [FI], et al) [X] 4,5,7,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 56 * * figures 6,7 *; | [X]WO9941670 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 4,5,7,9 * abstract ** page 2, line 3 - line 12 * |