EP1097863 - Electric power assist bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonobe, Hiroyuki, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Indust.Machin.Div., 1, Aza Takamichi, Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku, Nagoya, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Hisayoshi, Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Indust.Machin.Div., 1, Aza Takamichi, Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku, Nagoya, Aichi-ken / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123485.5 | 07.11.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | JP19990316594 | 08.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31659499 | JP19990368702 | 27.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36870299 | JP20000174633 | 12.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000174633 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1097863 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1097863 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B62M23/02, B62J7/04 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
B62M6/70 (EP);
B62M6/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/08] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrrad mit elektrischem Hilfsantrieb | [2001/19] | English: | Electric power assist bicycle | [2001/19] | French: | Bicyclette à assistance électrique | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 16.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/44] | 01.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4280581 (RUDWICK LAWRENCE A) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,3 * [Y] 3; | [Y]US4403672 (JAULMES CHRISTIAN [FR]) [Y] 3 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9317904 (SCHLOEGL JOHANN [AT], et al) [A] 11,14,16-18 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0561268 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 11,14,16-18 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9515276 (GOHR RAINER [DE]) [A] 11,14,16-18 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0729881 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 11,14,16-18* figure 1 * |