EP1100003 - Print system, service system, data server, master server, print client system and printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Toru c/o Konica Corporation, 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yanagimachi, Noriyuki c/o Konica Corporation, 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Inai, Masayuki c/o Konica Corporation, 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Nakazawa, Toshihiko c/o Konica Corporation, 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Yamazaki, Hirohiko c/o Konica Corporation, 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123539.9 | 27.10.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | JP19990345201 | 27.10.1999 Original published format: JP 34520199 | JP20000124049 | 25.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000124049 | JP20000186167 | 21.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000186167 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1100003 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1100003 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F3/12 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
G06F3/1207 (EP,US);
G06F3/1222 (EP,US);
G06F3/1238 (EP,US);
G06F3/1259 (EP,US);
G06F3/1287 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (EP,US);
G06Q30/018 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0643 (EP,US);
G07F17/16 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L69/04 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L69/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/20] | G06F3/12, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | [2005/07] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckersystem, Dienstsystem, Datenserver, Hauptserver, Druckerkundensystem und Drucker | [2001/20] | English: | Print system, service system, data server, master server, print client system and printer | [2001/20] | French: | Système d'impression, système de service, serveur de données, serveur maître, système de client d'impression et imprimante | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.01.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5220674 (MORGAN WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 68 * * column 6, line 39 - column 33, line 8 *; | [X]EP0825551 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-46 * column 1, line 37 - line 52 * * column 3, line 11 - column 14, line 3 *; | [X]EP0847002 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 20 *; | [X]US5832301 (YAMAGUCHI KOTARO [JP]) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * column 2, line 6 - line 25 ** column 3, line 1 - column 12, line 46 *; | [X]EP0881566 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-46 * abstract * * column 2, line 56 - column 8, line 50 * * column 9, line 22 - column 15, line 52 * |