EP1097967 - Biodegradable resin composition and its molded product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsushita, Teruki 9-10-303, Takashiro-cho Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0024 / JP | 02 /
Atsumi, Yoshiko 5-24-1-204, Ikejiri Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0027 / JP | 03 /
Itoh, Hiroshi 2-20-11, Katsuragi, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-1223 / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123742.9 | 31.10.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | JP19990312232 | 02.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31223299 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1097967 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1097967 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097967 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08L67/04, // (C08L67/02, 3:00),(C08L67/04, 3:00) | [2001/19] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/26 (EP,US);
C08L67/04, C08L2666/26 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/14] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bioabbaubare Harzzusammensetzung und daraus geformtes Produkt | [2001/19] | English: | Biodegradable resin composition and its molded product | [2001/19] | French: | Composition de résine biodégradable et son produit moulé | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/07] | 16.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5703160 (DEHENNAU CLAUDE [BE], et al) [X] 1-5* column 9, line 38 - line 58; claims 1,2 * |