EP1098108 - Hydraulic shock absorber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAYABA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. World Trade Center Bldg., 2-4-1, Hamamatsu-cho Minato-Ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states KAYABA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. World Trade Center Bldg., 2-4-1 Hamamatsu-cho Minato-Ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states KAYABA INDUSTRY CO., LTD. World Trade Center Bldg., 4-1, Hamamatsu-Cho 2-Chome Minato-Ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miura, Toshiya, c/o Kayaba Industry Co., Ltd. World Trade Center Bldg., 2-4-1, Hamamatsu-cho Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Miyazawa, Tadashi, c/o Kayaba Industry Co., Ltd. World Trade Center Bldg., 2-4-1, Hamamatsu-cho Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Rössig, Rolf, et al Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Rössig, Rolf, et al Beck & Rössig, Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 9 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123745.2 | 31.10.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | JP19990314944 | 05.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31494499 | JP20000127203 | 27.04.2000 Original published format: JP 2000127203 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1098108 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1098108 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098108 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/02, F16F9/16, F16F9/19, F16F9/22 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
F16F9/061 (EP,US);
F16F9/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2002/08] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Stossdämpfer | [2001/19] | English: | Hydraulic shock absorber | [2001/19] | French: | Amortisseur hydraulique | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 08.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3919509 (SCHNITZIUS KLAUS) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]CH639733 (MUELLER FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4985009 (SCHMIDT DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1* column A; figure - * |