EP1096069 - Multi-ply absorbent paper product having impressed pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP 133 Peachtree Street, N.E. Atlanta GA 30303 / US | [2007/19] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Fort James Corporation 1650 Lake Cook Road Deerfield, IL 60015-0089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulz, Galyn A. N 1536 Skyline Drive Greenville, Wisconsin 54942 / US | 02 /
Worry, Gary L. 3040 West Spencer Street Apt. J146 Appleton, Wisconsin 54914 / US | 03 /
Yeh, Kang Chang 1317 Blueberry Lane Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | 04 /
Kershaw, Thomas N. 409 East Wisconsin Avenue Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123758.5 | 01.11.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | US19990162981P | 01.11.1999 Original published format: US 162981 P | US20000564800 | 05.05.2000 Original published format: US 564800 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096069 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096069 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096069 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/40, B31F1/07, B32B29/06 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
B31F1/07 (EP,US);
B32B29/005 (US);
B32B23/02 (EP,US);
B32B23/10 (EP,US);
B32B3/28 (US);
B32B38/06 (US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/14 (US);
D21H27/002 (EP,US);
D21H27/30 (EP,US);
D21H27/40 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0725 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0728 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0733 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0738 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0743 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0764 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0774 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0787 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0789 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0792 (EP,US);
B32B2250/26 (US);
B32B2432/00 (US);
B32B2555/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/18] | Extension states | AL | 31.10.2000 | LT | 31.10.2000 | LV | 31.10.2000 | MK | 31.10.2000 | RO | 31.10.2000 | SI | 31.10.2000 | Title | German: | Mehrlagiges saugfähiges Papierprodukt mit einem geprägten Muster | [2001/18] | English: | Multi-ply absorbent paper product having impressed pattern | [2001/18] | French: | Produit multicouche en papier absorbant ayant un dessin en relief | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09156166.2 / EP2093326 | EP10168463.7 / EP2261420 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.06.2009 | CY | 03.06.2009 | DK | 03.06.2009 | FI | 03.06.2009 | TR | 03.06.2009 | SE | 03.09.2009 | GR | 04.09.2009 | PT | 03.10.2009 | IE | 01.11.2009 | LU | 01.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 01.11.2009 | ||
LU | 01.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
GR | 04.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
IE | 01.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
DK | 03.06.2009 | ||
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
PT | 03.10.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | ||
SE | 03.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 03.06.2009 | |
FI | 03.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3708366 (DONNELLY H); | [A]US3940529 (HEPFORD RICHARD R, et al); | [A]DE29808740U (WEPA PAPIERFABRIK P KRENGEL GM [DE]); | [A]US5840404 (GRAFF PIERRE [FR]) |