EP1097818 - Two-way print apparatus and print method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/10] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otsuka, Naoji Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Iwasaki, Osamu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123851.8 | 02.11.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | JP19990313790 | 04.11.1999 Original published format: JP 31379099 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1097818 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1097818 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097818 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/21 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
B41J19/142 (EP,US);
B41J2/2125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/14] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zwei-Wege Drucker und Druckverfahren | [2001/19] | English: | Two-way print apparatus and print method | [2001/19] | French: | Imprimante à deux chemins et procédé d'imprimer | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 04.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Request for further processing for: | 24.08.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 08.03.2006 | ES | 19.06.2006 | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 08.03.2006 | |
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | NL | 08.03.2006 | |
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | NL | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08295034 ; | [A]JPH07195715 ; | [A]US4528576 (KOUMURA NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 6, lines 36-54 *; | [E]EP1072421 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [E] 1-4,12-14,16-20,22,24,25 * column 4, lines 46-56 * * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0026] , [0029] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0042]; figures 5,11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08295034 A 19961112 (CANON INC) [A] 1-25 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07195715 A 19950801 (KATSURAGAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * abstract * |