EP1099403 - Device to open the lid of a washing-up machine such as a dish-washer, a pan-washer or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIHR SpA Via del Lavoro, 22/B 31033 Castelfranco Veneto (TV) / IT | [2001/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zardini, Fabio Via Stefani, 27 31033 Castelfranco Veneto / IT | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 00123987.0 | 03.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | IT1999UD00203 | 05.11.1999 Original published format: IT UD990203 | [2001/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099403 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099403 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
A47L15/0081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GR, IT [2002/07] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | SI | 18.10.2001 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Öffnen der Tür einer Waschmaschine wie einer Geschirrspülmaschine , einer Waschmaschine für Kochtöpfe oder Dergleichen | [2001/20] | English: | Device to open the lid of a washing-up machine such as a dish-washer, a pan-washer or similar | [2001/20] | French: | Dispositif pour ouvrir la porte d'une machine à laver telle qu'une machine à laver la vaisselle , une machine à laver les casseroles ou similaire | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 17.11.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GB, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 19.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3246938 (NOREN TORE H, et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3589787 (MESSERSMITH EUGENE) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US4811997 (SUYAMA KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]EP0629375 (STIERLEN MAQUET AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 2, line 44 - line 47 * |