EP1130360 - Sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Motz, Mario Dipl. -Ing. Duellerstrasse 14 9241 Wernberg / DE | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124024.1 | 04.11.2000 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | DE1999164002 | 30.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19964002 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130360 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130360 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130360 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01D3/02 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
G01D5/142 (EP,US);
G01D3/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/31] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sensor | [2001/36] | English: | Sensor | [2001/36] | French: | Capteur | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 31.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.01.2010 | NL | 06.01.2010 | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/36] | NL | 06.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS56119858 ; | [A]DE4409708 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE19701310 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811212), vol. 005, no. 196, Database accession no. (P - 093), & JP56119858 A 19810919 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | US4951236 | US4982351 | US5051937 | DE3786487T | DE19701310 |