EP1101873 - Filter tube for placing in a borehole and method for manufacturing the filter tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfleiderer water systems GmbH Ingolstädter Strasse 51 92318 Neumarkt / DE | [2005/10] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Pfleiderer Infrastrukturtechnik GmbH & Co. KG Ingolstädter Strasse 51 92318 Neumarkt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giangrasso, Antonio Schiessplatzstrasse 3 90469 Nürnberg / DE | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner, Blaumeier & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 119109 90101 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2005/12] | LINDER BLAUMEIER & KOLLEGEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124128.0 | 07.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | DE1999155973 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19955973 | [2001/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1101873 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1101873 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E03B3/18, E21B43/08 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
E03B3/20 (EP);
E21B43/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/21] | Title | German: | Filterrohr zum Einbringen in ein Bodenbohrloch sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung des Filterrohrs | [2001/21] | English: | Filter tube for placing in a borehole and method for manufacturing the filter tube | [2001/21] | French: | Tube filtrant à placer dans un puits et méthode de production de ce tube filtrant | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/28] | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE813992 (DEGEN WILHELM DIPL-ING) [X] 1,4,11 * page 2, line 33 - line 52 * * page 2, line 85 - line 115 * * figure 3; claims 1-3,5 * [A] 5,10; | [A]DE3024324 (HERDING ENTSTAUBUNG [DE]) [A] 1-4,9-11,13,14,17,18 * page 13 - page 17 * * figure -; claims 1,2,5,6,8 *; | [A]JPS60238115 | [A] - STRAUSS S, "GESINTERTE KUNSTSTOFF-FORMTEILE FUR DIE FEST-/FLUSSIG-FILTRATION", TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN, HAUS DER TECHNIK E.V., ESSEN, DE, (19920701), vol. 85, no. 2, ISSN 0040-1439, pages 100 - 104, XP000373585 [A] 1-7,9,11,13-17 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 5; table 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860422), vol. 010, no. 107, Database accession no. (C - 341), & JP60238115 A 19851127 (NODA SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 11,17,18 * abstract * |