EP1100120 - Method for fabricating thin film devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/20] | Thin film devices and method for fabricating thin film devices | ||
[2008/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states The Boeing Company M/S 13-08, P.O. Box 3707 Seattle, WA 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states The Boeing Company M/S 13-08, P.O. Box 3707 Seattle, WA 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states The Boeing Company D/676/ M/S 110-WSB43, P.O. Box 2515 Seal Beach, California 90740-1515 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiziloglu, Kursad 715 Gayley Avenue, Apt. 515 Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | 02 /
Fields, Charles H. 23901 Civic Center Way, 120 Malibu, CA 90265 / US | 03 /
Schmitz, Adele E. 1091 Amberton Lane Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2001/20] | 01 /
Kiziloglu, Kursad 715 Gayley Avenue, Apt. 515 Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | ||
02 /
Fields, Charles H. 23901 Civic Center Way, #120 Malibu, CA 90265 / US | |||
03 /
Schmitz, Adele E. 1091 Amberton Lane Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124504.2 | 09.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | US19990436662 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: US 436662 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1100120 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1100120 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100120 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02, H01L21/331, H01L21/335 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
H01L28/20 (EP,US);
H01L29/66318 (EP,US);
H01L29/66462 (EP,US);
H01L29/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/06] | H01L21/02, H01L21/8252 | ||
Former IPC [2001/20] | H01L21/311, H01L21/02, H01L21/331, H01L21/335 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für Dünnschichtbauelemente | [2008/31] | English: | Method for fabricating thin film devices | [2008/31] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de dispositifs en couches minces | [2008/31] |
Former [2001/20] | Dünnschichtbauelemente und Herstellungsverfahren für Dünnschichtbauelemente | ||
Former [2001/20] | Thin film devices and method for fabricating thin film devices | ||
Former [2001/20] | Dispositifs en couches minces et procédé de fabrication de dispositifs en couches minces | Examination procedure | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 27.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Request for further processing for: | 03.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09205081 ; | [X]US4076860 (KURODA HIROSHI); | [X]US4560435 (BROWN KAREN H [US], et al); | [X]US5227012 (BRANDLI GEROLD [CH], et al); |