EP1102232 - Applications for electronic reusable paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2009/10] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simoni, Helen Davis 11256 Redondo Court Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
Preas, Bryan T. 151 Cowper Street Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00124560.4 | 09.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | US19990440675 | 16.11.1999 Original published format: US 440675 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102232 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1102232 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102232 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1102232 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/00, G09F9/37 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
G09F9/372 (EP,US);
G09F27/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/21] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anwendungen für elektronisches wiederverwendbares Papier | [2001/21] | English: | Applications for electronic reusable paper | [2001/21] | French: | Applications pour papier électronique réutilisable | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.12.2009
26.08.2010
WITHDRAWN Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Patent und Lizenzen Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.12.2009
26.08.2010
WITHDRAWN Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.12.2009
WITHDRAWN Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | 14.01.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.11.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.03.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.04.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.11.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5160920 (HARRIS RICHARD H [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9704398 (JACOBSON JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 1 - line 24 * * figures 1-12 * [A] 2,5-10; | [A]US5930026 (JACOBSON JOSEPH M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 23 * * figure 5 *; | [A]EP0933752 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |